THE INSTITUTE FOR ARCHAEO-METALLURGICAL STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objectives of IAMS are the study of and research into the history and development of metallurgical processes in any part of the world. These objectives can be met by promoting and supporting international cooperation, by engaging in joint research, by setting up exhibitions, by undertaking archaeological expeditions, by teaching, lecturing and publishing relevant information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- China
Governance
- 13 August 1973: Standard registration
- I A M S (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT PERLMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr Michael Franklin Charlton | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Miljana Radivojevic | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Professor Jianjun Mei | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Lynn Biggs | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Mr Tom Albanese | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Marcos Martinon-Torres | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR THILO REHREN | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr CAROL BELL | Trustee | 15 November 2011 |
|
|||||||||
DR FELIX POSEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr JOHN MERKEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.00k | £7.25k | £5.00k | £8.86k | £1.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.57k | £1.74k | £4.32k | £6.27k | £18.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND MAY 1973
Charitable objects
THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF METALLURGICAL PROCESSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
WORLD WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON
INSTITUTE OF ARCHAEOLOGY
31-34 GORDON SQUARE
LONDON
WC1H 0PY
- Phone:
- 07734537153
- Email:
- m.radivojevic@ucl.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window