CHARITY FOR A VICARAGE AND AUGMENTATION OF THE INCOME OF THE VICAR

Charity number: 267414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities, and in particular to provide clerical assistance for the Vicar of St. Peter Mancroft Church, Norwich and to help further the religious and other charitable work of the Church of England within the parish of St. Peter Mancroft.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £40,085
Total expenditure: £44,167

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 May 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE ST PETER MANCROFT VICARAGE TRUST (Working name)
  • THE VICARAGE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GEOFFREY LOADES CBE Chair 31 July 1979
BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION FOR THE RELIEF OF DECAYED TRADESMEN, THEIR WIDOWS AND ORPHANS
Received: On time
JOHN RISEBROW'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER MANCROFT WITH ST. JOHN MADDERMARKET, NORWICH
Received: On time
Charles Richard Tobias Harris Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Linda Caroline Jarrold Trustee 07 November 2019
THE FORUM TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
NORWICH PRINTING MUSEUM
Received: On time
Cherri Diane Moseley Trustee 07 November 2019
SING YOUR HEART OUT
Received: On time
PAUL RAYMOND KING OBE Trustee 22 May 2001
None on record
COLIN IRVING PORDHAM Trustee 14 September 1972
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER MANCROFT WITH ST. JOHN MADDERMARKET, NORWICH
Received: On time
ST JOHN'S NORFOLK CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £51.80k £39.77k £40.05k £36.50k £40.09k
Total expenditure £59.55k £48.99k £55.37k £55.05k £44.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 The Mews
Arlington Lane
NORWICH
NR2 2BY
Phone:
01603610160
Website:

No information available