THE PENELOPE AND OLIVER MAKOWER 1974 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) The commissioning of major objects of silver for long-term loan to national museums etc. b) The support of the young, especially young silversmiths and jewellers and the support of Bishopsland Workshops. c)The making of general charitable contributions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 October 1974: Standard registration
- P & O MAKOWER TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM MAKOWER | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Jane Penelope Makower Mather | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE ANN MAKOWER MCSD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.83k | £7.74k | £9.05k | £12.52k | £11.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.31k | £2.40k | £1.14k | £3.03k | £6.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH MARCH 1974 AND DEED OV VARIATION DATED 15TH AUGUST 1974
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME TO SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BISHOPSLAND
DUNSDEN
SOUTH OXFORDSHIRE
READING
RG4 9NR
- Phone:
- 01189724550
- Email:
- o.makower@bishopsland.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window