Financial history SWAFFHAM PRIOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 267862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.88k £73.35k £16.30k £17.77k £17.79k
Total expenditure £24.86k £78.54k £21.15k £13.35k £21.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £72.00k £3.20k N/A N/A