Financial history THE TRURO DIOCESAN GUILD OF RINGERS

Charity Number: 268122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.22k £7.77k £9.54k £8.10k £9.38k
Total expenditure £3.98k £14.53k £13.10k £2.22k £14.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A