Financial history KING GEORGE'S FIELD, CAISTER - ON - SEA

Charity number: 268208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £25.50k £37.46k £58.03k £88.69k £100.98k
Total expenditure £12.22k £21.83k £45.30k £95.63k £105.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £4.05k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.01k £10.10k £4.05k £3.90k £15.12k