Financial history FINSBURY AND CLERKENWELL VOLUNTEERS

Charity Number: 268511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.25k £38.06k £30.77k £30.47k £34.61k
Total expenditure £40.80k £34.86k £35.66k £41.74k £38.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A