Financial history THE DUKE OF CORNWALL'S CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 269183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £124.88k £102.85k £117.01k £163.93k £276.69k
Total expenditure £308.22k £301.11k £266.61k £164.03k £276.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A