THE HAMPSHIRE BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation of buildings of historic and architectural interest in and around Hampshire so that they may remain for future generations to enjoy and, especially, the rescue and preservation of machinery and products relating to the brick and tile making industry at Bursledon Brickworks, Swanwick and its development as a Museum of Brickmaking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 September 1975: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER CHARLES GOODSHIP | Chair | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
CHRISTINE DOMINIQUE BERESFORD | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
SARAH ANNE ROBERTS | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
ANDREW ROBERT MASON | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
David Hubbard | Trustee | 04 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Wayne Irish | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr CELIA MARY CLARK | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
BILL FERGIE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
ELEANOR BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.08k | £2.43k | £1.05k | £2.53k | £2.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.30k | £8.60k | £5.57k | £8.12k | £8.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ARTICLES AND MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH JULY 1975, AMENDED 7 NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF HAMPSHIRE AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL, CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND HAMPSHIRE IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTERESTS OR ANCIENT MOUNUMENTS.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 Garnier Drive
EASTLEIGH
Hampshire
SO50 6HE
- Phone:
- 02382 514635
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window