Financial history THE PETERBOROUGH SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 269667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.95m £6.29m £7.14m £7.81m £8.16m
Total expenditure £6.07m £6.06m £6.89m £7.50m £8.04m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants £402.77k £227.74k £247.30k £200.58k £198.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £209.99k £44.26k £6.11k £4.15k £31.71k
Income - Other trading activities £26.75k £23.21k £58.85k £60.18k £69.73k
Income - Charitable activities £5.70m £6.21m £7.04m £7.63m £7.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16.51k £9.79k £17.08k £114.65k £140.59k
Income - Other £2.15k £0 £17.79k £0 £9.99k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.99m £6.03m £6.83m £7.41m £7.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £79.58k £29.29k £57.69k £89.71k £120.78k
Expenditure - Governance £22.97k £23.27k £23.16k £28.16k £23.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £3.67k £3.72k £3.99k £3.82k £4.33k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0