Financial history MUSIC EDUCATION COUNCIL

Charity number: 270004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.38k £8.11k £5.90k £4.96k £9.15k
Total expenditure £23.61k £13.19k £5.94k £4.34k £9.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A