Financial history ETHEL BAKER BEQUEST

Charity number: 270274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £801 £429 £429 £250 £358
Total expenditure £4.22k £3.91k £3.91k £525 £1.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A