Financial history COPTHORNE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 270757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.34m £3.96m £3.96m £3.77m £2.89m
Total expenditure £4.18m £4.18m £4.28m £4.25m £3.24m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £295.80k £144.00k £79.09k £62.65k £53.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.03m £3.82m £3.88m £3.68m £2.82m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.60k £381 £1.40k £23.09k £20.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.14m £4.12m £4.25m £4.20m £3.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £39.53k £53.87k £30.38k £46.59k £17.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0