Financial history CHAPTER OF THE ORDER OF THE HOLY PARACLETE

Charity number: 271117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £830.19k £603.23k £714.93k £715.44k £1.01m
Total expenditure £1.34m £1.43m £1.33m £1.34m £1.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £53.78k £185.49k £163.00k N/A £4.47k
Income - Donations and legacies £181.96k £44.95k £212.68k £121.26k £395.98k
Income - Other trading activities £16.22k £14.77k £42.57k £98.85k £28.72k
Income - Charitable activities £433.27k £369.00k £331.12k £340.83k £463.02k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £191.61k £174.51k £136.92k £154.51k £118.12k
Income - Other £7.14k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £60.37k £2.96k £151.52k £87.77k £73.93k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.31m £1.40m £1.30m £1.31m £1.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £31.77k £30.90k £32.51k £28.77k £24.72k
Expenditure - Governance £14.82k £7.92k £7.92k £8.47k £9.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £44.83k £18.81k £21.53k £34.47k £53.40k
Expenditure - Investment management £30.52k £30.38k £32.51k £28.77k £24.72k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0