Financial history Z V M RANGOONWALA FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 271513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.29m £765.00k £2.16m £2.62m £2.89m
Total expenditure £1.17m £816.24k £2.06m £2.67m £1.98m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.29m £765.00k £2.16m £2.62m £2.89m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.17m £816.24k £1.99m £2.61m £1.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.30k £3.60k £0 £5.40k £5.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.02m £697.19k £1.99m £2.61m £1.91m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £72.45k £63.05k £66.40k