Deputy's Gift Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Main purpose is to provide a Christmas day lunch and party for residents of Brightlingsea who as individuals, couples or families may otherwise be on their own. Also for the same group to provide local outings, tea parties and visits to local theatre productions.Charitable support for other Brightlingsea Groups and/or Individuals is at the Deputy's discretion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 09 April 1976: Standard registration
- DEPUTY'S GIFT FUND (Working name)
- THE DEPUTY OF BRIGHTLINGSEA'S CHRISTMAS GIFT FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Alexander Linton | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Derek Spurling | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Michael Wilby | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Harvey Beadles | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.70k | £1.80k | £2.88k | £1.65k | £1.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.46k | £2.45k | £3.69k | £3.24k | £3.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/04/1976 AS AMENDED ON 11/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 25 MAY 2016 as amended on 01 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FUND ARE TO RELIEVE THE INHABITANTS OF THE CINQUE PORT LIBERTY AND TOWN OF BRIGHTLINGSEA INCLUDING THE FREEMEN THEREOF AND THEIR DEPENDENTS WHEREVER SUCH FREEMEN AND THEIR DEPENDENTS MAY BE RESIDENT IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE TO INCLUDE THE AGED, INFIRM AND SICK PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THEIR HOMES OR IN HOSPITALS OR OTHER INSTITUTIONS AND IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF TO OBTAIN COLLECT, RECEIVE AND VEST IN THE TRUSTEES OF THE FUND MONEY, INVESTMENTS, SECURITIES AND ALL OTHER REAL AND PERSONAL PROPERTY AND ASSETS WHEREVER SITUATE BY WAY OF CONTRIBUTIONS, DONATIONS, LEGACIES, GRANTS, DEVISES, BEQUESTS, TRANSFERS, LOANS AND ANY OTHER LAWFUL METHOD AND TO APPLY THE SAME AND/OR THE INCOME THEREFROM FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES HEREINBEFORE REFERRED TO AND AS REQUIRED BY THE RULES OF THE FUND OR OTHERWISE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWFUL DIRECTIONS OF THE DEPUTY FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE CINQUE PORT LIBERTY OF BRIGHTLINGSEA (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE DEPUTY”).
Area of benefit
CINQUE PORT LIBERTY AND TOWN OF BRIGHTLINGSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 Seaview Road
Brightlingsea
COLCHESTER
CO7 0PR
- Phone:
- 07905129273
- Email:
- doug.stone@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window