Financial history THE KING'S OWN ROYAL REGIMENT (LANCASTER) REGIMENTAL MUSEUM

Charity number: 272109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.41k £459 £0 £31.92k £45.95k
Total expenditure £10.69k £1.73k £300 £33.44k £31.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A