Financial history THE HADRIAN TRUST

Charity number: 272161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £238.70k £243.47k £248.20k £256.52k £259.73k
Total expenditure £238.79k £235.35k £251.33k £256.44k £255.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A