WOKING CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We meet each week to learn music and put on 3 concerts each year which we promote to the wider public. Our aims are to promote singing and choral music within the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 December 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David George Clubley | Chair | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Watkins | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Moorwood | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Culshaw | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Lear | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judith Vickers | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS MAUNDERS | Trustee | 29 September 2014 |
|
|||||
JOHN HOWARD ANTHONY ROWLAND | Trustee |
|
||||||
MAKY MANOLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.04k | £18.54k | £7.14k | £25.20k | £28.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.93k | £24.76k | £1.47k | £18.63k | £32.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 28 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 08/11/1976 AS AMENDED ON 09/05/1994 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/1999 AS AMENDED ON 23/05/2005 AS AMENDED ON 09/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 25 APR 2016 as amended on 25 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
WOKING
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Graylands Close
WOKING
Surrey
GU21 4LR
- Phone:
- 01483767852
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window