HIGHCROFT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and distribution of grants and donations for charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 June 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Mordechai Eisner | Trustee | 05 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bella Reicher | Trustee | 05 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD FISCHER | Trustee | 29 December 1975 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250.58k | £151.48k | £244.13k | £27.82k | £57.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.95k | £120.31k | £293.36k | £255.73k | £53.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 July 2023 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 July 2023 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH DECEMBER 1975
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES INCLUDIN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST PERSONS WHO IN THE UNCONTROLLED OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE OF THE JEWISH FAITH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION AND THE STUDY OF THE TORAH.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Basing Hill
LONDON
NW11 8TE
- Phone:
- 02084585382
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window