Financial history THE FUSILIERS MUSEUM OF NORTHUMBERLAND

Charity number: 273064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £36.76k £96.61k £70.83k £99.10k £125.92k
Total expenditure £49.31k £86.06k £73.78k £79.71k £79.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.80k £1.11k N/A N/A N/A