THE KING EDWARD'S SCHOOL WITLEY EDUCATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education generally and in particular at King Edward's Scool Witley by making bursary and other grants to individual students and to King Edward's School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 April 1977: Standard registration
- 11 September 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 11 September 2017: Funds transferred to 311997 BRIDEWELL ROYAL HOSPITAL
No other names
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.74m | £568.46k | £146.09k | £198.56k | £142.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.49k | £136.35k | £163.72k | £172.03k | £176.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.65m | £447.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £89.86k | £121.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.65m | £444.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £143.40k | £131.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.36k | £5.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £100.00k | £102.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | -£3.27k | -£4 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 25 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 25 November 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 10 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 10 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 26 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 26 November 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16TH FEBRUARY 1977
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY THEREOF THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AT KING EDWARD'S SCHOOL WITLEY OF THROUGH THE MEDUIM OF THE SCHOOL. (2) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF OR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE, OR WHO INTEND OF DESIRE TO BECOME OR WHO HAVE BEEN PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window