BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR CEMETERIES IN SOUTH ASIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the preservation, conservation and recording of former European cemeteries and isolated monuments in South Asia and elsewhere in Asia. To promote education in the history of all places in South Asia and elsewhere in Asia associated with European residence and in particular the territories formerly administered by the Honourable East India Company and the British Government of India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bangladesh
- India
- Pakistan
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 19 May 1977: Standard registration
- B A C S A (Working name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Benjamin Dean | Chair | 20 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Robert Charles Hardy Boon | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Magowan | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mohd Yasin Zargar | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Denise Love | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Charles Andrew George Greig | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
DR ROSIE LLEWELLYN-JONES MBE | Trustee | 11 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Mr Peter Boon | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
DR RICHARD JOHN BINGLE | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.93k | £34.35k | £37.36k | £71.86k | £38.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.77k | £31.19k | £47.64k | £55.38k | £46.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 30TH MARCH 1977 AS AMENDED ON 22/10/2015 as amended on 22 Oct 2020 as amended on 23 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND RECORDING OF FORMER EUROPEAN CEMETERIES AND ISOLATED MONUMENTS IN SOUTH ASIA AND ELSEWHERE IN ASIA. (B) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY OF ALL PLACES IN SOUTH ASIA AND ELSEWHERE IN ASIA ASSOCIATED WITH EUROPEAN RESIDENCE AND IN PARTICULAR THE TERRITORIES FORMERLY ADMINISTERED BY THE HONOURABLE EAST INDIA COMPANY AND THE BRITISH GOVERNMENT OF INDIA. (C) TO CONSERVE AND BEAUTIFY CEMETERIES FALLING WITHIN THESE OBJECTS AS WELL AS THEIR IMMEDIATE ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
ASIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARN END
LONDON ROAD
BLEWBURY
DIDCOT
OX11 9PB
- Phone:
- 01235850410
- Email:
- secretary@bacsa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window