Financial history THE SALAMANDER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 273657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £61.83k £60.61k £54.79k £52.63k £51.49k
Total expenditure £96.20k £105.81k £159.19k £169.77k £177.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A