THE MAGDALEN COLLEGE DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TRUST WAS ESTABLISHED PRIMARILY AS A FUNDRAISING BODY TO MEET THE NEEDS OF MAGDALEN COLLEGE, AND PROVIDES ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO THE COLLEGE ON FUNDRAISING STRATEGY, PROJECTS AND EXECUTION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£3,841,586
Donations and legacies | £3.84m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.42k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,841,586
Raising funds | £960 | |
Charitable activities | £3.84m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £960 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.84m |
People

18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 09 July 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON HASLAM | Chair | 21 November 2008 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
The Hon Daniel Higgins | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Yong Shen | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Yoko Everest-Phillips | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Oscar Chow | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Dinah Gwen Lison Rose KC | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
PROF ROBIN CLEVELAND | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Paul Tosetti | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Jonathan Turner | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Robert Peter Leechman | Trustee | 06 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Thomas Karl Meakin | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
JAMES PAUL CRONIN | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
MRS E C DAVIES | Trustee | 25 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
LORD JAY OF EWELME | Trustee | 19 November 2010 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Dr BARBARA DOMAYNE-HAYMAN | Trustee | 20 November 2009 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Prof John Nightingale | Trustee | 03 November 2006 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
ANTHONY TODD | Trustee | 20 May 2005 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
FELICITY ROSALIND TOUBE QC | Trustee | 01 January 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.63m | £2.29m | £4.98m | £7.80m | £3.84m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63m | £2.29m | £4.55m | £8.23m | £3.84m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.63m | £2.29m | £4.98m | £7.78m | £3.84m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £186.85k | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.90k | £117 | £1.23k | £15.59k | £1.42k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £78.61k | £300.51k | £2.39m | £3.69m | £1.09m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.63m | £2.29m | £4.55m | £8.23m | £3.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £508 | £676 | £542 | £635 | £960 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.17k | £3.32k | £4.04k | £4.37k | £4.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.62m | £2.29m | £4.55m | £8.22m | £3.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.57m | £334.75k | £5.30m | £315.80k | £160.42k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.55m | £314.75k | £4.85m | £295.80k | £140.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8TH JUNE 1977 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20TH JULY 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE COLLEGE. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF DECLARATION OF TRUST)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAGDALEN COLLEGE
HIGH STREET
OXFORD
OX1 4AU
- Phone:
- 01865276105
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window