Financial history THE M D AND S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 273992
Charity reporting is up to date (83 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £734.13k £543.61k £645.12k £459.46k £368.57k
Total expenditure £687.68k £739.99k £946.45k £517.43k £609.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £425.76k £243.88k £362.05k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £308.37k £299.73k £283.07k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £554.41k £647.64k £802.57k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £133.27k £92.35k £143.88k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.28k £8.08k £5.99k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £542.68k £633.61k £796.19k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £133.27k £92.35k £143.88k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A