Financial history BASINGSTOKE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 274009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £37.89k £19.31k £34.41k £175.01k £0
Total expenditure £29.13k £8.95k £50.22k £58.75k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A