HERTFORDSHIRE COUNTY GUIDES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 274225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Statement of Purpose Girlguiding UK enables girls and young women to develop their potential and to make a difference to the world

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £402,390
Total expenditure: £202,687

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 September 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GIRLGUIDING HERTFORDSHIRE (Working name)
  • 3RD BUSHEY HEATH GUIDE COMPANY (Previous name)
  • HERTFORDSHIRE COUNTY OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sally Settle Trustee 06 September 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Louise Pinnington Trustee 05 September 2024
None on record
Claire Kemp Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Karen Pett Trustee 01 May 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN WITH ST JULIAN, ST ALBANS
Received: On time
Emma McLaughlin Trustee 01 September 2023
HARPENDEN AND REDBOURN DIVISION GIRL GUIDES
Received: On time
Sue Beswick Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Nicola Weisfeld Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
Jo Bushe Trustee 01 August 2021
GIRLGUIDING WEST HERTFORDSHIRE
Received: On time
JANET ELIZABETH EAVIS Trustee 29 September 2020
LEES WOOD CAMPSITE
Received: On time
Sheila Hill Trustee 01 September 2020
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD DISTRICTS GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Elaine Alexandra WIlson Trustee 01 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOURS ST ALBANS
Received: On time
Karin Hunter Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Lynn O Bryan Trustee 02 April 2020
None on record
Anne Johns Trustee 01 January 2019
SOUTH WEST DIVISION OF THE HERTFORDSHIRE COUNTY GUIDES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £302.53k £177.06k £156.54k £161.38k £402.39k
Total expenditure £265.23k £145.22k £139.37k £149.42k £202.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k £18.24k £3.23k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
County Office
Girlguiding Hertfordshire
Cottered
BUNTINGFORD
Hertfordshire
SG9 9QP
Phone:
07918 167 366