HAVERGAL BRIAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Havergal Brian society exists to promote public knowledge of the work of the composer William Havergal Brian (1876-1972) and, to this end, to support and sponsor its publication, performance and recording.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 June 1978: Standard registration
- HBS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Paul Stone | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Graham Ascough | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Sage | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARTIN CHRISTOPHER GROSSEL | Trustee | 31 August 2013 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JOHN PICKARD | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|||||
MIKE LUNAN | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN BECKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN JOHN ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.21k | £31.78k | £53.13k | £11.10k | £8.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.47k | £13.76k | £13.92k | £27.88k | £83.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27 JAN 1978 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 JAN 1980 AS AMENDED ON 25 FEB 1995 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 28 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAY 2020 AS AMENDED ON 15 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED ON 22 MAY 2021 AS AMENDED ON 05 FEB 2022 as amended on 11 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE TO PROMOTE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE LIFE AND WORKS OF WILLIAM HAVERGAL BRIAN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Oak Drive
COLWYN BAY
Clwyd
LL29 7YP
- Phone:
- 01492 471835
- Email:
- treasurer@havergalbrian.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window