Financial history BRENT LODGE BIRD AND WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity Number: 276179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.01m £1.08m £829.09k £821.30k £0
Total expenditure £538.26k £585.41k £626.67k £675.14k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £75.26k £104.48k £2.00k £10.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £776.18k £829.84k £486.25k £483.14k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £234.55k £246.04k £339.55k £331.19k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.79k £1.35k £3.29k £6.97k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £515.20k £530.81k £246.12k £255.53k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £345.29k £357.06k £380.92k £408.50k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £192.97k £228.35k £245.75k £266.64k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £10.43k £11.22k £7.62k £6.79k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A