RAPHAEL AND ERNESTINE TUCK TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Raphael and Ernestine Tuck Trust Fund is constituted and governed by the will of the late Sir Adolph Tuck Bart. The trustees intend to continue making provisions to such beneficiaries as are appropriate under the terms of the will. They intend to maintain the current level of reserves invested for income to support those provisions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 October 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Hartnell | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|||||
MICHELLE BENA BAUERNFREUND | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|||||
ARI JESNER | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.31k | £3.13k | £3.20k | £3.14k | £2.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.23k | £15.77k | £427 | £30.46k | £20.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IN PRINCIPAL PROBATE REGISTRY ON 17TH DECEMBER 1926
Charitable objects
AUGMENTING THE SALARIES AND STIPENDS OF JEWISH MINISTERS AND READERS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND FOR ASSISTING AND TRAINING JEWISH MINISTERS AND READERS BY GRANTS OR BY PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS OR EXHIBITIONS FOR THE THEOLOGICAL STUDENTS FOR THE JEWISH MINISTRY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNITED SYNAGOGUE
305 BALLARDS LANE
LONDON
N12 8GB
- Phone:
- 020 8343 8989
- Email:
- michelle@chiefrabbi.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window