BRITISH MEXICAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE RICH CULTURAL HERITAGE OF MEXICO BY OFFERING A FORUM FOR ANYONE RESIDING IN THE UK WHO IS INTERESTED IN MEXICO AND ITS TRADITIONS. TO RAISE FUNDS FOR CHARITABLE PROJECTS IN MEXICO.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Mexico
Governance
- 02 November 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Henry Maudslay CBE | Chair |
|
||||||
Susana Seijas | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan M Warmington | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
William McMillan | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MAUDSLAY CROSS | Trustee | 03 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAMARIS ALBARRAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.91k | £8.01k | £3.37k | £3.05k | £6.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.07k | £3.10k | £2.30k | £8.22k | £3.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SOCIETY'S RULES ADOPTED 1942 AS AMENDED 26/10/1978, 29/11/1993 & 27/11/2013
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF CITIZENS OF THE UK ABOUT MEXICO AND FOR CITIZENS OF MEXICO ABOUT THE UK, IN EACH CASE INCLUDING ITS PEOPLE, ITS HISTORY, ITS GEOGRAPHY, ITS CULTURE, ITS ECONOMICS AND RELATED SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHAIRMAN
PO BOX 251
MORPETH
NE61 9DH
- Phone:
- 08709220697
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window