BOTH PARENTS MATTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Families Need Fathers is a self help charity which provides information and support on children's issues for separated and divorced parents (including unmarried parents), as well as grandparents, partners, friends, and the extended family. Our main concern is to maintain a child's relationship with both parents during and after family breakdown.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 February 1979: Standard registration
- 23 July 2018: Funds received from 1120885 TORQUAY CHILD CONTACT CENTRE
- F N F (Working name)
- BOTH PARENTS MATTER (Previous name)
- FAMILIES NEED FATHERS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Jeremy O'Callaghan | Chair | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mihir Parikh | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Sanders | Trustee | 02 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Carr | Trustee | 02 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JAMES DAVIS | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Greg Cavadino | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sergio Martinez-Lopez | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emlyn Jones | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Baker | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Martin | Trustee | 16 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
LEE GRICE | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.71k | £116.69k | £161.06k | £54.62k | £53.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.97k | £99.38k | £125.63k | £103.36k | £92.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 OCTOBER 1978 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 MARCH 1999, 27 JUNE 2000, 7 JULY 2002, 30 SEPTEMBER 2007 AND 26 JUNE 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JUL 2017 as amended on 13 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: (I) FOR THE RELIEF OF PARENTS AND THEIR CHILDREN AND OTHER CLOSE FAMILY MEMBERS SUFFERING FROM THE CONSEQUENCES OF DIVORCE OR SEPARATION BY PROVIDING ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND OTHER SUPPORT AND, IN SO DOING, HELPING PARENTS STAY IN TOUCH WITH THEIR CHILDREN AFTER DIVORCE OR SEPARATION; (II) TO FURTHER THE EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN WHOSE PARENTS HAVE DIVORCED OR SEPARATED BY ENCOURAGING SHARED PARENTING ARRANGEMENTS WHICH ENABLE SUCH CHILDREN TO HAVE CONTINUING AND MEANINGFUL RELATIONSHIPS WITH BOTH THEIR PARENTS; (III) TO CONDUCT STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO PROBLEMS CONCERNED WITH CHILDREN WHO ARE DEPRIVED OF THE PRESENCE OF A PARENT IN THEIR FAMILIES, AND INTO THE PROBLEMS CONCERNED WITH ESTABLISHING GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PARENTS LIVING APART FROM THEIR CHILDREN, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ALL SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH IN ORDER TO ENCOURAGE APPROPRIATE CHANGES IN PROFESSIONAL AND PUBLIC OPINION; (IV) TO RELIEVE POOR PARENTS BY HELPING TO OBTAIN AND PROMOTING THE PROVISION OF LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND OTHER LEGAL SERVICES WHICH SUCH PERSONS WOULD BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN BY REASON OF THEIR LACK OF MEANS.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 OLD GLOUCESTER STREET
HOLBORN
LONDON
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 03000300110
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window