Financial history THE H J C STEVENS ORGAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity Number: 277067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £892 £728 £841 £970 £1.04k
Total expenditure £1.51k £2 £1.50k £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A