Financial history ZOROASTRIAN TRUST FUNDS OF EUROPE (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 277185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £543.13k £753.36k £474.28k £400.54k £1.14m
Total expenditure £381.38k £336.92k £386.10k £668.20k £1.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.92k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £390.86k £602.56k N/A N/A £1.07m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £63.68k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments £225.00k £221.00k N/A N/A £425.00k
Income - Investment £152.27k £127.87k N/A N/A £213.25k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £125.00k £381.56k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £381.38k £272.26k N/A N/A £1.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £64.66k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £73.00k £70.20k N/A N/A £78.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £30.60k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £64.66k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0