FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is the parent-teacher association for St Mary's Church of England primary school. It makes grants to organisations to buy resources to enhance the children's school activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 03 April 1979: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S SCHOOL SUPPORTERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHERYL PAYNE | Chair | 02 July 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Wing Yan Clara Lee | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/09/2019 | 03/09/2020 | 03/09/2021 | 03/09/2022 | 03/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.66k | £11.40k | £10.15k | £13.13k | £36.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.82k | £7.55k | £3.40k | £7.35k | £82.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 September 2023 | 31 March 2025 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 320 days | |
Annual return | 03 September 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 September 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 September 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 September 2019 | 29 June 2021 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2019 | 29 June 2021 | 361 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH OCTOBER 1976 AS AMENDED 6 OCTOBER 1983, 21 SEPTEMBER 1993 AND 16 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, NOT OTHERWISE PROVIDED FOR BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
PUTNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARY'S CE PRIMARY SCHOOL
FELSHAM ROAD
PUTNEY
LONDON
SW15 1BA
- Phone:
- 02087889591
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window