THE WHITMINSTER VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of the facilities for the use of the inhabitants of the village of Whitminster and its surrounds for recreation and other leisure time occupations in the interest of social welfare, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said persons
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 11 February 1985: Standard registration
- WHITMINSTER VILLAGE HALL & PLAYING FIELD (Working name)
- THE WHITMINSTER RECREATION GROUND AND PLAYING FIELD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN FREDERICK JONES | Chair |
|
||||||
Sheila Drape | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Jack Greensweig | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Maule | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Johns | Trustee | 27 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
HONOR KATHLEEN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA MARY GILMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TIM DOUGLAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.79k | £42.33k | £37.59k | £43.09k | £73.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.09k | £40.09k | £35.48k | £37.83k | £91.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £240 | N/A | £1.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.34k | £21.67k | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 FEBRUARY 1985.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WHITMINSTER FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WHITMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Whitminster Village Hall
School Lane
Whitminster
Gloucester
GL2 7NT
- Phone:
- 07887516672
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window