Financial history THE NICHOLAS JOELS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 278409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £15.15k £15.47k £16.46k £15.60k £17.33k
Total expenditure £9.00k £20.25k £20.95k £38.42k £25.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A