THE NOTGROVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Notgrove Trust will consider appeals from charities operating in Gloucestershire. It also contributes to a few charities outside this area where the trustees have an established connection.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 October 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arabella Catherine Acland | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Henry Rowbotham | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
LUCY HENRIETTA MORRIS | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Diana Frances Acland | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
HARRY ALEXANDER ACLAND | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.83k | £212.01k | £169.27k | £151.87k | £75.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £841.92k | £168.24k | £298.33k | £178.16k | £311.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1979
Charitable objects
1. FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. 2. FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST EMPLOYEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS OF D A AND MRS S E ACLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MANOR
NOTGROVE
CHELTENHAM
GL54 3BT
- Phone:
- 01451850239
- Email:
- diana@notgrove.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window