Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF BIRMINGHAM ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity number: 279500
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £37.89k £35.91k £28.74k £32.66k £35.08k
Total expenditure £35.91k £33.38k £29.20k £43.65k £41.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A