Trustees ROTARY CLUB OF BIRMINGHAM ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 279500
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL WOOD Chair 12 May 2014
None on record
Robert James Lee Trustee 27 November 2023
THE PRINCETHORPE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MERTON HOUSE HOLIDAY HOTEL LIMITED
Received: On time
Barry Badham Trustee 30 June 2022
THE ROTARY CLUB OF BIRMINGHAM CHARITABLE FUND
Charity reporting is overdue by 390 days
David Payne Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
Umar Choudhury Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record