FRESH STREAMS NETWORK LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide inspiration, encouragement, a website, written papers, a network and prayer support to primarily church ministers and church leaders mainly within, although not exclusively so, the Baptist Union of Great Britain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 May 1980: Standard registration
- FRESH STREAMS (Working name)
- MAINSTREAM (Previous name)
- MAINSTREAM (BAPTISTS FOR LIFE AND GROWTH) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Adrian Semerene | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Peter James Everitt | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV AMY LOUISE WEARING | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARK FREDERICK ELDER | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALI SUMMERS | Trustee | 27 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV. ANDY GLOVER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.43k | £30.49k | £96.36k | £95.73k | £91.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.98k | £39.39k | £84.24k | £99.85k | £100.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/04/1980 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND IN ALL OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOOLE LIGHTHOUSE CENTRE
68 WESTMINSTER ROAD
HOOLE
CHESTER
CH2 3AU
- Phone:
- 01244312037
- Email:
- office@freshstreams.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window