THE WILLIE AND MABEL MORRIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity consists of a portfolio of stock exchange investments and cash which produces an income. This income is used to make donations to other registered charities to be used for general charitable purposes, with an emphasis on supporting charities active in certain medical areas as specified in the governing document (namely cancer, heart trouble, neurological diseases, and arthritis).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 July 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phoebe Susan Lindsay Tether | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
VERITY ANNE LINDSAY TETHER | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
ANGELA MICHELLE TETHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
Suzanne Jane Marriott | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.67k | £138.35k | £148.56k | £156.95k | £155.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.93k | £150.07k | £133.29k | £127.72k | £179.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 March 2023 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 March 2023 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 JUNE 1980 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF MODIFICATION DATED 3 JUNE 1980
Charitable objects
1) GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY CHARITY FOR THE RELIEF OF PHYSICAL ILL HEALTH IN PARTICULAR CANCER, HEART TROUBLE, SPASTICITY , ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 THE HOLLIES
SHEFFORD
SG17 5BX
- Phone:
- 01462851897
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window