Financial history FRENCHAY VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 281177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £38.19k £34.94k £36.33k £45.23k £50.35k
Total expenditure £20.43k £20.55k £24.77k £28.62k £26.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.18k £25.70k N/A N/A N/A