Financial history BEROSA CHARITY LIMITED

Charity Number: 281296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £24.14k £3.47k £0 £800.00k £314.00k
Total expenditure £161.48k £401.69k £1.12k £5.15k £183.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £800.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £3.41k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.74k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £3.41k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £1.74k N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A