Financial history THE AVON CENTRE LIMITED

Charity Number: 281648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £360.00k £226.06k £371.48k £410.05k £417.53k
Total expenditure £349.58k £243.79k £296.42k £395.82k £384.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £33.26k £67.31k £3.75k £4.51k £4.83k