FRIENDS OF SHALSHELET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION THROUGH EDUCATION OF THE INSTITUTION OF MARRIAGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 28 January 1981: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 25 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN MONICA STORFER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £321 | £0 | £108 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £200 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 195 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 195 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 561 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 561 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 926 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 926 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1291 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1291 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1656 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1656 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH DECEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
A. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS WITH REGARD TO TH INSTITUTION OF MARRAGE AND IN PARTICULAR BY EMPHASINSING TRADITIONAL JEWISH VALUES ANG THEIR BENEFICIAL EFFECT IN PROMOTING HEALTHY EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL AND SEXUAL RELATIONSHIPS AND WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING PERSONAL RESPONSIBILITIES AND ENRICHING FAMILY LIFE. B. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL RELEVANT ASPECTS OF MARRIED LIFE AND (WHERE APPROPRIATE) TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF ALL SUCH RESEARCH. C. TO SAFEGURARD AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN AND TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAK-UP OF MARRAGES.
Area of benefit
UK AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 LINFIELD CLOSE
LONDON
NW4 1BZ
- Phone:
- 02089515188
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window