Financial history S K CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 283406
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £192.25k £356.91k £159.12k £256.56k £217.19k
Total expenditure £129.76k £252.59k £252.53k £317.73k £271.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A