THE BURTON PYNSENT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manages and preserves Burton Pynsent Monument.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 November 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Timothy Schroder | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|||||||
ELLEN CHARLOTTE LE BRETON SCHRODER | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||
GEOFFREY THEED | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.26k | £2.54k | £2.54k | £4.30k | £4.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 April 2025 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 December 2024 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 15TH OCTOBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAID INCOME AND (IF AND SO OFTEN AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT) THE WHOLE OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR THE BENFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES (WHICH WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TERMS SHALL INCLUDE ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS INSTITUTIONS FOUNDATIONS OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT, (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF SETTLEMENT).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 STEELES ROAD
LONDON
NW3 4RE
- Phone:
- 02077225937
- Email:
- TIM@SCHRODER.UK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window