Financial history THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 284450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £943.47k £136.49k £157.58k £187.11k £242.26k
Total expenditure £102.13k £101.93k £158.43k £214.37k £189.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £884.79k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £58.68k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £800.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £102.13k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.23k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A